Born et al v. Exxonmobil Pipeline Company et al

Plaintiff: Jeff Born, Erin Born, Watson-Watson LLC and Southern Sporting Arms LLC
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation, Exxonmobil Pipeline Company and Mobil Pipe Line Company
Case Number: 4:2013cv00213
Filed: April 11, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. Each party will bear its own costs, fees, and expenses incurred in the litigation. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/09/2014. (rhm)
December 10, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/10/13. (kpr)
November 15, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting plaintiffs' Jeff and Erin Born and defendants' joint 28 Motion to Dismiss. The claims against Jeff and Erin Born are dismissed with prejudice. This Order does not apply to separate plaintiffs Watson-Watson, LLC and Southern Sporting Arms, LLC, both of whom remain as plaintiffs in this action. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 11/15/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Born et al v. Exxonmobil Pipeline Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ExxonMobil Corporation
Represented By: Michelle Marie Kaemmerling
Represented By: Stephen R. Lancaster
Represented By: Edwin L. Lowther, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exxonmobil Pipeline Company
Represented By: Jane A. Kim
Represented By: Michael D. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mobil Pipe Line Company
Represented By: Scott Andrew Irby
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Born
Represented By: James S. Whitlock
Represented By: Thomas W. Mickel
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erin Born
Represented By: James S. Whitlock
Represented By: Thomas W. Mickel
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Watson-Watson LLC
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Represented By: Thomas W. Mickel
Represented By: James S. Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Sporting Arms LLC
Represented By: Matthew W. Adlong
Represented By: Gary A. Davis
Represented By: Thomas W. Mickel
Represented By: James S. Whitlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?