Gomillion v. UAMS et al

Plaintiff: Charlotte Gomillion
Defendant: Pam Marcum, Gloria S Scott, UAMS, Albert Johnson and Diane Hopper
Case Number: 4:2013cv00281
Filed: May 8, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 3, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice. More than 90 days has passed since the 44 Order was entered, and no lawyer has entered an appearance as counsel for Gomillion. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 06/03/2014. (rhm) (Docket text modified on 6/3/2014 to correct a typographical error).
February 27, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 44 motion for stay of proceedings. This action is hereby stayed for a period of 90 days to enable Gomillion to seek counsel. The stay will be lifted when and if a lawyer enters an appearance as counsel for Gomillion. If, at the end of 90 days, no lawyer has entered an appearance as counsel for Gomillion, this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/27/2014. (ks)
February 7, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 35 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. 39 Motion for leave to file a third amended complaint is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/7/2014. (ks)
January 10, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying plaintiff that if she does not file a response to the 35 motion to dismiss on or before 1/17/2014 the Court will assume that the motion is uncontested and will act accordingly. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 1/10/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gomillion v. UAMS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Marcum
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria S Scott
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAMS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Johnson
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Hopper
Represented By: Sherri L. Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Gomillion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?