Tillman et al v. Pulaski County et al

Plaintiff: John Tillman and Todd Holmes
Defendant: Pulaski County, Doc Halladay, Pulaski County Sheriff Department, Sarah Spears, Carl L Johnson, Randy Morgan and Health Services
Case Number: 4:2013cv00340
Filed: June 4, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 20, 2016 116 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Tillman's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Holmes's deliberate-indifference claims and his claims against the Pulaski County Sheriff's Department are dismissed without prejudice. Holmes's other claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2016. (jak)
April 7, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion. A new scheduling order will be issued promptly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 4/7/2015. (jak)
June 20, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part as moot 44 Motion to Dismiss. Holmes's deliberate-indifference claims are dismissed without prejudice. His negligence claims go forward. The Clerk of Court is directed to re-instate Doc Halladay and Randy Morgan as defendants. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve copies of the 47 Amended Complaint with any attachments and a summons without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/20/2014. (jak)
January 21, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Plaintiff to provide notice of his new address to the Court within 14 days of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 01/21/2014. (rhm)
September 11, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 10 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff Tillman's claims are dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Holmes's claims against Halladay, Morgan, and the Pulaski County Sheriff's Department are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/11/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tillman et al v. Pulaski County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Tillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Halladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Spears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl L Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?