Eoff v. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: Dan Eoff
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency and Bob Perciasepe
Case Number: 4:2013cv00368
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Van Buren
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2016 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The stay, 83 , is lifted. The Court approves the parties' settlement and will enter the consent decree embodying it. Unopposed motion, 93 , granted. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2016. (jak)
April 20, 2016 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court congratulates the parties on their settlement in principle. Joint motion, 82 , granted as modified. The parties must file a joint notice by 6 May 2016 outlining the terms of their tentative agreement. Please file his paper under sea l. Joint status reports due by 1 June 2016 and 1 August 2016. The Court will hold a hearing on the proposed consent decree, if needed, at 3:00 p.m. on Wednesday 17 August 2016. The Amended Final Scheduling Order, 69 , is suspended. The August 2016 trial is cancelled. Case stayed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2016. (jak)
March 2, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion. Counts II and III of Eoff's complaint are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/2/2016. (jak)
November 24, 2015 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 60 Motion for Partial Judgment on the pleadings. The parties' request to extend the stay on the counter-claim is granted. Stay extended until 1 February 2016. If the parties want a settlement conference with a M agistrate Judge, they should jointly request one by 10 December 2015. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. If the parties don't resolve the case by February 2016, then the Court will reinstate 60 and all related filings, and decide th at motion. Due to the age of the case the Court will proceed on an expedited schedule - three months of discovery, then motions, and any trial the week of 8 August 2016 as a first-out setting. The parties should be prepared to disclose experts, and provide reports, at the beginning of March 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/24/2015. (jak)
May 19, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Corps requests a deadline for a motion seeking judgment on the peadings on Eoff's remaining constitutional claims, 52 . That deadline is 19 June 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/19/2015. (jak)
June 13, 2014 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion to Stay Defendant's Counterclaim. Defendants' 41 Motion to Stay is denied. The 32 Final Scheduling Order is suspended. Eoff's motion for judgment due 11 July 2014. Defendants' response due 15 August 2014. Eoff's reply due 29 August 2014. The parties should promptly notify the Court by joint report about any material development in the criminal investigation. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/12/2014. (jak)
May 16, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 33 Motion to Intervene by the State of Arkansas. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/16/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eoff v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Perciasepe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan Eoff
Represented By: J. Grant Ballard
Represented By: Charles A. Banks
Represented By: Kent Tester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?