Ransom v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al

Plaintiff: Michael David Ransom
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center and Karl Byrd
Case Number: 4:2013cv00444
Filed: August 2, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 46 Order that was entered on this day, Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendant, and this case is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/5/2014. (ks)
February 13, 2014 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the clerk to mail Plaintiff: (1) a copy of the docket sheet in this case; and (2) copies of the 1/7/2014 Final Scheduling Order 22 and the 1/8/2014 Order 23 . Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/13/2014. (kcs)
September 9, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 Partial Report and Recommendations in their entirety; therefore, deft Faulkner County Detention Center is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; the U.S. Marshal is directed to serve summons, complaint 2 , the Partial Recommended Disposition 6 , and this Order on deft Byrd without prepayment of fees and costs. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/9/13. (vjt)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ransom v. Faulkner County Detention Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karl Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael David Ransom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?