Robertson et al v. Pennington et al

Plaintiff: Randy Robertson, Christopher Phillips and Patrick Ragsdale
Defendant: Bruce Pennington and Birdsong
Case Number: 4:2013cv00508
Filed: August 29, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 60 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed with prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 03/06/2015. (rhm)
February 10, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 26 Proposed Report and Recommendations are approved in its entirety. Co-Plaintiffs Christopher Phillips and Patrick Ragsdale are dismissed without prejudice. Some of Plaintiff Randy Robertson's claims are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 2/10/2014. (mmd)
November 15, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing service on defendants Bruce Pennington and Lt Birdsong re 13 Order. The Clerk of Court shall prepare summons for the defendants and the US Marshal is directed to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint on defendants without prepayment of fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 11/15/2013. (rhm) (Modified on 11/15/2013 to correct a typographical error) (kdr).
October 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 12 Response (Non Motion) filed by Patrick Ragsdale, Christopher Phillips, 13 Order. These pleadings were mailed to plaintiff at his last-known address and were returned to sender. Plaintiff Phillips shall notify this Court of his current address within 30 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 10/11/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robertson et al v. Pennington et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Ragsdale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Birdsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?