Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al

Plaintiff: Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Harry Pepper & Associates Inc, Ray Bradshaw, Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC and United Rentals North America Inc
Counter_claimant: Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC
Counter_defendant: Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv00512
Filed: September 3, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court needs one more piece of information before ruling on Harry Pepper & Associates' motion, 47 . Please file, as an addendum to the motion, the completed certificate of service showing when the "Notice to Judgment Debtor" was sent to Caraway Sheet Metal & Construction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2016. (jak)
February 17, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Harry Pepper & Associates Inc shall have judgment against Caraway Sheet Metal & Construction Inc for $63,012.66. This judgment shall accrue interest at 6% starting on 29 January 2016. Caraway's claims against Harry Pepper & A ssociates Inc, and Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America are dismissed with prejudice. Caraway's claims against Ray Bradshaw, Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC, and United Rentals North America Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC's counterclaim against Caraway Sheet Metal & Construction Inc is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/17/2016. (jak)
June 19, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Clarify. Parties beyond Pepper and Caraway may participate in the arbitration. The Court will not compel their participation absent some agreement by other parties to arbitrate.. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/19/2015. (jak)
January 6, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 22 MOTION to Stay. The case is stayed as to all parties and all claims. The case is administratively terminated. If there has been no action by 31 December 2014, then the Court will reopen and dismiss all claims of all parties without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/6/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc
Represented By: David A. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Pepper & Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Bradshaw
Represented By: William Phillips Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC
Represented By: William Phillips Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Rentals North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: Bradshaw Crane Rental LLC
Represented By: William Phillips Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Caraway Sheet Metal and Construction Inc
Represented By: David A. Orsini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?