Jansen v. Wekerle

Plaintiff: Brooks Jansen
Defendant: Michael Wekerle
Case Number: 4:2013cv00606
Filed: October 24, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 5, 2015 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 83 Motion to Dismiss. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/5/2015. (ks)
May 6, 2015 39 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting 32 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Wekerle's 34 cross motion for summary judgment on the issue of punitive damages is denied. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/6/2015. (jak) (Docket text modified on 5/6/2015 to correct the description of the document filed.)(thd)
February 14, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 3 Motion to Strike ; granting 5 Motion to Dismiss for the tort of outrage. Jansen must file an amended complaint, consistent with this Opinion and Order, within 14 days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/14/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jansen v. Wekerle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooks Jansen
Represented By: Kevin Mark Odum
Represented By: James F. Swindoll
Represented By: Bud Bernard Whetstone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Wekerle
Represented By: Bruce E. Munson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?