Williams v. Central Arkansas Transit et al

Plaintiff: Clifton James Williams, Sr
Defendant: Central Arkansas Transit and Dinnis Wicker
Case Number: 4:2013cv00623
Filed: October 31, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 11, 2014 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 13 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/11/2014. (jak)
February 27, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to docket Williams's 13 Letter as a motion to reconsider. The Court will hold a hearing on the motion on 19 March 2014 at 4:00p.m. in Courtroom B-155 of the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/27/2014. (jak)
February 20, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Williams's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/20/2014. (ks)
January 23, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 plaintiff's request to reconsider. He may proceed in forma pauperis. Williams's claims against defendant Wicker are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim. The Clerk should prepare and deliver a summons, along with a copy of the complaint, to the U.S. Marshal for service on Central Arkansas Transit. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/23/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Central Arkansas Transit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arkansas Transit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dinnis Wicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifton James Williams, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?