Ramsey et al v. Desoto Gathering Company LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wyborny, William E Smith, Virginia Mills, Allan Peterson, Loveta Pruitt, Brenda Shirley, Jenny Whitehurst, Jeffrey Wyborny, Margaret Smith, Virgie Parrott, Clifford Pruitt, Richard Ramsey, Barbara Ramsey, William Smith, Nita Chastain, Tammy Peterson, Molly Stone, Claudia Southerland, Cary Shirley, Thomas Whitehurst, Lindell Southerland and Casey Chastain
Defendant: Vanguard Permian, LLC, Southwestern Midstream Services Company, Antero Resources Corporation and Desoto Gathering Company LLC
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Seeco Inc
Case Number: 4:2013cv00626
Filed: November 4, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2015. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2015 Filing 113 LETTER to Faulkner County Circuit Court transmitting copy of file and certified copies of Order to Remand and docket sheet sent via certified mail. (ljb)
February 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to forthwith REMAND this case to the Circuit Court of Faulkner County, Arkansas, as federal jurisdiction no longer exists over this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/12/2015. (ljb)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting #102 motion to sever; dismissing Defendants Vanguard and Antero; and giving Plaintiffs 30 days from the date of this Order to file a new complaint on the severed claims. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/11/2015. (rhm)
February 6, 2015 Filing 110 REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 MOTION to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims Reply of Defendants Vanguard Permian, LLC and Antero Resources Corp. to the Separate Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Sever Class Action Royalty Claims filed by Antero Resources Corporation, Vanguard Permian, LLC. (Fields, Robin)
February 3, 2015 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to Motion re #102 MOTION to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims filed by Margaret Smith, William E Smith. (Holton, Timothy)
January 30, 2015 Filing 108 RESPONSE in Opposition re #102 MOTION to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order from Smith I, #2 Exhibit Excerpt from 01/15/2015 Hearing, #3 Exhibit C. Chastain Interrogatory Responses, #4 Exhibit Letter from T. Holton)(Blythe, Michele)
January 29, 2015 Filing 107 RESPONSE to Motion re #102 MOTION to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims filed by Vanguard Permian, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Lewis, Todd)
January 23, 2015 Filing 106 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on January 15, 2015, before Judge Bill Wilson. Court Reporter Christa R. Jacimore. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 2/2/2015. Redaction Request due 2/13/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/23/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/23/2015. (plm)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 LETTER/ ORDER regarding the appointment of Judge Rosenbaum as a special master for discovery; finding as moot pltfs' Motion to Compel #98 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/21/15. (tjb)
January 20, 2015 Filing 104 REPLY to Response to Motion re #98 MOTION to Compel Answers to Discovery filed by Margaret Smith, William E Smith. (Holton, Timothy)
January 16, 2015 Filing 103 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #102 Motion to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims filed by Margaret Smith, William E Smith. (Holton, Timothy)
January 16, 2015 Filing 102 MOTION to Sever Class Action Royalty/Contract Claims by Margaret Smith, William E Smith (Holton, Timothy)
January 16, 2015 Filing 101 Letter to Hon. James M. Rosenbaum signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/15/2015. (rhm)
January 15, 2015 Filing 100 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Billy Roy Wilson:Telephone Conference held on 1/15/2015. Parties make arguments regarding discovery. The Court will appoint a special master to preside over discovery. An order is forthcoming. Court is in recess. PL: Tim Holton & Michael McGartland; Dfts: Alan Perkins, Michele Blythe, Michael Morfey, Todd Lewis, Heidi Nichols & Robin Fields. (Court Reporter Christa Jacimore.) (mmb)
January 14, 2015 Filing 99 RESPONSE to Motion re #98 MOTION to Compel Answers to Discovery filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Perkins, G.)
January 6, 2015 Filing 98 MOTION to Compel Answers to Discovery by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Breach of Contract Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit Class Interrogatories)(Holton, Timothy)
December 5, 2014 Filing 97 REPLY re #96 Response (Non Motion), Plaintiffs' Reply to Defendants Response to Notice of Violation of the Court's Order by William E Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holton, Timothy)
December 2, 2014 Filing 96 RESPONSE re #94 Notice (Other), of Violation of Court's Order Concerning Designation of Documents, etc. by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Morfey, Michael)
November 25, 2014 Filing 95 SEALED Documents (jap)
November 24, 2014 Filing 94 NOTICE by Margaret Smith, William E Smith of Violation of Court's Order Concerning Discovery (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sealed, #2 Exhibit Sealed, #3 Exhibit Sealed, #4 Exhibit Sealed, #5 Exhibit Sealed, #6 Exhibit Sealed, #7 Exhibit Sealed, #8 Exhibit Sealed, #9 Exhibit Sealed)(Holton, John)
November 17, 2014 Filing 93 ANSWER to #91 Crossclaim by Antero Resources Corporation.(Lewis, Todd)
November 13, 2014 Filing 92 TRANSCRIPT of Telephone Conference Proceedings held on September 30, 2014, before Judge Bill Wilson. Court Reporter Judith A. Ammons. Transcript may be viewed only at the public terminals in the Clerk's office. Copies of transcript are only available through the Official Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. DEADLINES: Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 11/24/2014. Redaction Request due 12/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/15/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/11/2015. (plm)
October 27, 2014 Filing 91 CROSSCLAIM against Antero Resources Corporation, filed by Seeco Inc(Blythe, Michele)
September 30, 2014 Filing 90 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.)Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Billy Roy Wilson:Telephone Conference held on 9/30/2014. Parties present to discuss discovery dispute regarding depositions. Arguments made. Court establishes dates for depositions to be held. Court is in recess. Pl: Timothy Holton; Dft: G. Alan Perkins, Michele Blythe, Robin Fields, Heidi Nichols, and Todd Lewis (Court Reporter Judy Ammons.) (mmb)
September 11, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 89 PROTECTIVE ORDER regarding confidential material in this action. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/11/14. (tjb)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER finding as moot Plaintiffs' #82 Motion to Compel; and denying Defendants' #84 Motion for Protective Order. Counsel are directed to submit a proposed protective order, consistent with the earlier proposals as modified by this Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/29/2014. (mcz)
August 25, 2014 Filing 87 RESPONSE in Opposition re #82 First MOTION to Compel filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (Blythe, Michele)
August 19, 2014 Filing 86 RESPONSE in Opposition re #84 MOTION for Protective Order from All Defendants filed by Margaret Smith, William E Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Protective Order)(Holton, John)
August 18, 2014 Filing 85 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #84 Motion for Protective Order from All Defendants filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Plaintiffs' Proposed Protective Order in Hill, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Protective Order in Hill)(Blythe, Michele)
August 18, 2014 Filing 84 MOTION for Protective Order from All Defendants by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Protective Order)(Blythe, Michele)
August 13, 2014 Filing 83 Defendant SEECO's ANSWER to #81 Crossclaim of Antero Resources Corporation by Seeco Inc.(Blythe, Michele)
August 11, 2014 Filing 82 First MOTION to Compel by All Plaintiffs (Holton, Timothy)
July 23, 2014 Filing 81 CROSSCLAIM against Seeco Inc, filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Fields, Robin)
July 22, 2014 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Patrick Lewis on behalf of Antero Resources Corporation (Lewis, Todd)
July 22, 2014 Filing 79 NOTICE of Appearance by Heidi M. Nichols on behalf of Antero Resources Corporation (Nichols, Heidi)
July 22, 2014 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by Robin F. Fields on behalf of Antero Resources Corporation (Fields, Robin)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 77 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #75 Defendant Antero's Motion to Substitute Counsel. Accordingly, Todd Lewis, Robin Fields, and Heidi Nichols are substituted as counsel and Nicholas Shum, James D. Thompson, III, Charles T. Coleman, and Elizabeth Devaney are relieved as counsel.On another issue: based on Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(d)(1), counsel should refrain from filing discovery or notices of discovery (see Doc. No. #76 ). Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 06/09/14. (dmm)
June 9, 2014 Filing 76 NOTICE by William Smith of Service of Discovery (Holton, Timothy)
June 9, 2014 Filing 75 MOTION to Substitute Attorney For Defendant Antero Resoures Corporation by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
April 25, 2014 Filing 74 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint,, by Antero Resources Corporation.(Coleman, Charles)
April 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #72 Defendant Antero Resources Corp's unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Antero's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, April 25, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/16/14. (dmm)
April 15, 2014 Filing 72 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to answer Second Amended Complaint by Antero Resources Corporation (Devaney, Elizabeth)
April 10, 2014 Filing 71 NOTICE by Margaret Smith, William E Smith, William Smith of Filing Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures (Holton, Timothy)
March 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER pltfs with claims relating to the operation of the Scotland CPF-2 and Midge CPF-2 Compressor Stations - Clifford and Loveta Pruitt; Jeffrey and Kimberly Wyborny; Allan and Tammy Peterson; Virginia Mills; Molly Stone; Barbara and Richard Ramsey; Cary and Brenda Shirley; and Virgie Parrot - are removed from this action; Vanguard's motion #36 is granted; the motions filed by DeSoto Gathering, SW Midstream and Seeco #39 and Antero #56 are granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/27/14. (tjb)
March 4, 2014 Filing 69 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Fields, Robin)
February 28, 2014 Filing 68 Defendant SEECO, Inc's ANSWER to #65 Crossclaim of Vanguard Permian, LLC by Seeco Inc.(Greathouse, Julie)
February 28, 2014 Filing 67 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #66 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
February 28, 2014 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
February 10, 2014 Filing 65 CROSSCLAIM against Seeco Inc, filed by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C - Part 1, #4 Exhibit C - Part 2, #5 Exhibit C - Part 3)(Lewis, Todd)
February 10, 2014 Filing 64 ANSWER to #41 Crossclaim by Vanguard Permian, LLC.(Lewis, Todd)
February 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 63 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #61 #62 Defendant Vanguard Permian's Motions for Leave for Ms. Heidi M. Nichols and Ms. Robin F. Fields to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Ms. Nichols and Ms. Fields are directed to register for CM/ECF in the Eastern District of Arkansas by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, February 20, 2014. Failure to register may result in removal from this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/06/14. (dmm)
February 5, 2014 Filing 62 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Robin F. Fields. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2383093. Filed by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Todd)
February 5, 2014 Filing 61 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Heidi M. Nichols. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2383091. Filed by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lewis, Todd)
February 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #56 MOTION TO DISMISS by Antero Resources Corporation; response due by 5:00 p.m., Friday, February 28, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 2/4/14. (tjb)
February 3, 2014 Filing 59 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey (Holton, Timothy)
January 31, 2014 Filing 58 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
January 31, 2014 Filing 57 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #56 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Antero Resources Corporation. (Coleman, Charles)
January 31, 2014 Filing 56 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Antero Resources Corporation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Purchase and Sale Agreement)(Coleman, Charles)
January 30, 2014 Filing 55 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie DeWoody Greathouse on behalf of Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Greathouse, Julie)
January 29, 2014 Filing 54 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #53 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
January 29, 2014 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #39 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
January 29, 2014 Filing 52 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #51 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
January 29, 2014 Filing 51 RESPONSE in Opposition re #36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of Vanguard to Dismiss Portions of the Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity as to Vanguard filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
January 29, 2014 Filing 50 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial re-set for 7/14/2015 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Discovery due by 4/15/2015. Dispositive motions due by 4/30/2015. Pretrial Disclosure Sheets due by 6/15/2015. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/29/14. (mmb)
January 28, 2014 Filing 49 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 7/15/2014 at 9:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # A401 before Judge Billy Roy Wilson. Discovery due by 4/16/2014. Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2014. Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 6/16/2014. Entered at the direction of the Court on 1/28/14. (mmb)
January 27, 2014 Filing 48 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Vanguard Permian, LLC. (Lewis, Todd)
January 27, 2014 Filing 47 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (Morfey, Michael)
January 27, 2014 Filing 46 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. (Holton, Timothy)
January 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 45 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #42 #43 #44 Defendant Antero Resources Corporation's Motions for Mr. Nicholas Shum, Mr. James Thompson, and Ms. Elizabeth Devaney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Accordingly, Mr. Shum, Mr. Thompson, and Ms. Devaney are directed to register for CM/ECF in the Eastern District of Arkansas by 5:00 p.m., Thursday, February 6, 2014. Failure to register may result in removal from this case. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/23/14. (dmm)
January 23, 2014 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Elizabeth Devaney. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2375448. Filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
January 23, 2014 Filing 43 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James D. Thompson III. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2375425. Filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
January 23, 2014 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Nicholas Shum. Fee $100 receipt number 0860-2375402. Filed by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
January 15, 2014 Filing 41 CROSSCLAIM against Vanguard Permian, LLC, filed by Seeco Inc(Morfey, Michael)
January 15, 2014 Filing 40 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #39 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (Perkins, G.)
January 15, 2014 Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Perkins, G.)
January 15, 2014 Filing 38 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint,, by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company.(Perkins, G.)
January 15, 2014 Filing 37 ANSWER to #27 Amended Complaint,, Answer of Vanguard Permian, LLC to Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint by Vanguard Permian, LLC.(Lewis, Todd)
January 15, 2014 Filing 36 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Motion of Vanguard to Dismiss Portions of the Second Amended Complaint and Class Action Complaint for Failure to Plead Fraud with Particularity as to Vanguard by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Lewis, Todd)
January 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #34 Defendant Antero Resources Corporation's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Accordingly, Defendant Antero Resources Corporation's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Friday, January 31, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/14/14. (dmm)
January 14, 2014 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Amended Complaint,, by Antero Resources Corporation (Coleman, Charles)
January 14, 2014 Filing 33 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Amended Complaint on Antero Resources, filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. Antero Resources Corporation served on 12/26/2013. (Holton, Timothy)
January 14, 2014 Filing 32 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Amended Complaint on Vanguard Permian, filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey. Vanguard Permian, LLC served on 12/26/2013. (Holton, Timothy)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 31 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting in part #30 Defendant Vanguard Permian, LLC's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond. Accordingly, Defendant Vanguard Permian, LLC's answer or responsive pleading must be filed by 5 p.m., Wednesday, January 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/27/13. (dmm)
December 27, 2013 Filing 30 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #27 Amended Complaint,, by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Lewis, Todd)
December 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #28 Motion to Extend Time. Accordingly, Defendants' Response is now due by 5:00 p.m. Wednesday, January 15, 2014. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/27/2013. (jak)
December 23, 2013 Filing 28 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time to File A Response to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #27 Amended Complaint,, () by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Blythe, Michele)
December 18, 2013 Summons Issued as to Antero Resources Corporation, Vanguard Permian, LLC. (jap)
December 18, 2013 Filing 27 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, Southwestern Midstream Services Company, Antero Resources Corporation, Vanguard Permian, LLC, filed by Cary Shirley, Margaret Smith, Barbara Ramsey, Loveta Pruitt, William E Smith, Virgie Parrott, Jeffrey Wyborny, Lindell Southerland, Claudia Southerland, Molly Stone, Jenny Whitehurst, Virginia Mills, Kimberly Wyborny, Tammy Peterson, Richard Ramsey, Nita Chastain, Allan Peterson, Thomas Whitehurst, Clifford Pruitt, Brenda Shirley, William Smith, Casey Chastain (jap)
December 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER finding as moot #8 Motion to Dismiss; finding as moot #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #2 Complaint ; granting #25 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Plaintiffs must file their amended complaint by 5:00 on Friday, December 20, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/13/13. (kpr)
December 12, 2013 Filing 25 Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Holton, Timothy)
December 12, 2013 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #10 Third Party Complaint by Vanguard Permian, LLC (Lewis, Todd)
December 12, 2013 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Patrick Lewis on behalf of Vanguard Permian, LLC (Lewis, Todd)
December 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying #3 Motion to Dismiss by DeSoto Gather Company, LLC; pltfs' response to the second Motion to Dismiss #8 is due by 5:00 p.m., Wednesday, December 18, 2013. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/10/13. (tjb)
November 27, 2013 Filing 21 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #20 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge Billy Roy Wilson. (mar)
November 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER regarding #12 NOTICE of Related Case, the Clerk is directed to assign this case directly to Judge Wilson. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/27/13. (vjt)
November 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting pltfs' #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to defts' #8 MOTION to Dismiss; pltfs' response must be filed within 30 days after an Order is entered on pltfs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/19/13. (vjt)
November 15, 2013 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by All Plaintiffs (Holton, Timothy)
November 12, 2013 Filing 17 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Based on #16 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Judge J. Leon Holmes. (plm)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The Clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case, due to a conflict. Signed by Judge James M. Moody on 11/12/2013. (mcz)
November 11, 2013 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Southwestern Midstream Services Company (Perkins, G.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Seeco Inc (Perkins, G.)
November 11, 2013 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Desoto Gathering Company LLC (Perkins, G.)
November 6, 2013 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case by Barbara Ramsey; Case Number 4:12-cv-0423 and 0690 (Holton, Timothy)
November 6, 2013 Filing 11 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 1/13/2014; Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/27/2014; Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 10/20/2014 in Little before Judge James M. Moody. Signed by D. Jackson at the Direction of the Court on 11/6/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed FSO)(dmj)
November 4, 2013 Filing 10 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Vanguard Permian, LLC, filed by Seeco Inc. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, and Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss, by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, and Southwestern Midstream Services Company. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 7 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, and Southwestern Midstream Services Company.(mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 6 RESPONSE to Defendant's #3 Motion to Dismiss, filed by Barbara Ramsey. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT and Class Action Complaint with Jury Demand against DeSoto Gathering Company, LLC, Southwestern Midstream Services Company, and SEECO, Inc., filed by Barbara Ramsey, Richard Ramsey, Brenda Shirley, Cary Shirley, William Smith, Margaret Smith, William E Smith, Clifford Pruitt, Loveta Pruitt, Virgie Parrott, Lindell Southerland, Claudia Southerland, Molly Stone, Virginia Mills, Tammy Peterson, Allan Peterson, Casey Chastain, Nita Chastain, Jenny Whitehurst, Thomas Whitehurst, Kimberly Wyborny, and Jeffrey Wyborny. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 4 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 Motion to Dismiss filed by Desoto Gathering Company LLC. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Desoto Gathering Company LLC. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Desoto Gathering Company LLC, filed by Barbara Ramsey. (mcz)
November 4, 2013 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Desoto Gathering Company LLC, Seeco Inc, and Southwestern Midstream Services Company from Faulkner County Circuit Court, case number 23CV-13-624. Fee of $ 400 paid, receipt #LIT042697. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey et al v. Desoto Gathering Company LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wyborny
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William E Smith
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Mills
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Peterson
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loveta Pruitt
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Shirley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenny Whitehurst
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Wyborny
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Smith
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virgie Parrott
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford Pruitt
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ramsey
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Ramsey
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Smith
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nita Chastain
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Peterson
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Stone
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Southerland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cary Shirley
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Whitehurst
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lindell Southerland
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Chastain
Represented By: Timothy R. Holton
Represented By: John R. Holton
Represented By: Michael P. McGartland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanguard Permian, LLC
Represented By: Robin F. Fields
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: Heidi M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southwestern Midstream Services Company
Represented By: Michele R. Blythe
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: Kimberly Logue
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Michael D. Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antero Resources Corporation
Represented By: Nicholas Shum
Represented By: Todd Patrick Lewis
Represented By: James D. Thompson, III
Represented By: Charles T. Coleman
Represented By: Robin F. Fields
Represented By: Elizabeth Devaney
Represented By: Heidi M. Nichols
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desoto Gathering Company LLC
Represented By: Michele R. Blythe
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Julie DeWoody Greathouse
Represented By: Kimberly Logue
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Michael D. Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Seeco Inc
Represented By: G. Alan Perkins
Represented By: Kimberly Logue
Represented By: Jeffrey Martin Swann
Represented By: Michael D. Morfey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?