Mitchell v. Wal-Mart

Plaintiff: Faith H Mitchell
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Case Number: 4:2013cv00637
Filed: November 6, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Garland
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 15, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER deeming that this case has settled re 19 Stipulation. Mitchell's complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/15/2014. (jak)
December 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Reconsideration re 4 Order. Mitchell must pay the $400 filing fee in full by February 26,2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/13/13. (kpr)
November 6, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Provisionally Granting 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Faith H Mitchell without paying fees or costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/6/13. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faith H Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?