Thomas v. Chandler et al

Plaintiff: Kataka Nigel Thomas
Defendant: Chad Pruett, Jessica Chandler, David Stone and James Spaul
Case Number: 4:2013cv00665
Filed: November 21, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Izard
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT : Pursuant to the 34 Order entered in this matter on this date, it is Considered, Ordered and Adjudged that this case be, and it is hereby, dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/05/2014. (rhm)
January 28, 2014 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING PROPOSED FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS except as to Defendant James Spaul. The Clerk of the Court is directed to prepare a summons for Defendant James Spaul and the U S Marshal is directed to serve a copy of 5 Amended Complaint and summons on Defendant without prepayment or security of fees and costs. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 01/28/2014. (rhm)
January 13, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the Amended Complaint and summons on defendants Jessica Chandler and Chad Pruett in care of the Faulkner County Detention Center, 500 German Lane, Conway, AR 72034-7014, without prepayment of fees therefor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 1/13/14. (kpr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Chandler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jessica Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Spaul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kataka Nigel Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?