Riggs-Degraftenreed v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc et al

Plaintiff: Katina Riggs-Degraftenreed
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc, Wells Fargo Bank NA and Wilson & Associates PLLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv00669
Filed: November 22, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 14, 2016 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting part and denying in part 92 Motion for attorney's fees and costs. Wells Fargo owes Riggs-Degraftenreed a total of $19,998.15 for costs and fees. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/14/2016. (jak)
January 29, 2016 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Katina Riggs-DeGraftenreed shall have judgment against Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., jointly and severally for $4,328.91, post-judgment interest at 0.46%, and Rule 54 costs as may later be allowed. The Court will consider awarding a reasonable attorney's fee on timely motion. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/29/2016. (jak)
April 27, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report, 54 , addressed. Discovery is extended again until 29 May 2015 to allow 30(b)(6) depositions to be taken on a mutually convenient date without sprinting. Any dispositive motion due by 15 June 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2015. (jak)
April 7, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint report, 52 , noted. The Court assumes plaintiff's deposition was taken on 1 April 2015 as planned. Wells Fargo must provide amended disclosures by 13 April 2015 if it has not already done so. Discovery is extended until 1 May 2015 to accommodate the remaining depositions. Any dispositive motion is due by 15 May 2015. The Scheduling Order, 51 , is suspended. The Court will reschedule trial, if necessary, after evaluating the motion papers. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/7/2015. (jak)
June 27, 2014 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion to Amend. 17 and 21 Motions to Dismiss are granted in part and denied in part. What remains is Riggs-Degraftenreed's breach-of-contract claim against the Wells Fargo Defendants; all other claims are dismissed. Wilson & Associates is out of the case. Scheduling Orders, with an expedited timetable, will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/27/2014. (jak)
March 10, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to file a reply to be filed by 17 March 2014 to Riggs-Degraftenreed's 38 Response. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2014. (jak)
February 12, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 19 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Responses to the pending 17 and 21 Motions to Dismiss due by 28 February 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/12/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Riggs-Degraftenreed v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katina Riggs-Degraftenreed
Represented By: Luther Oneal Sutter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage Inc
Represented By: Blair Beavers Evans
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Blair Beavers Evans
Represented By: Bradley E. Trammell
Represented By: David L. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson & Associates PLLC
Represented By: David M. Donovan
Represented By: James M. Simpson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?