Bartlett v. Little Rock Arkansas, City of

Plaintiff: Giuseppina Bartlett
Defendant: Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Case Number: 4:2013cv00682
Filed: November 27, 2013
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (jak)
January 15, 2015 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint status report, 13 , noted and appreciated. The discovery deadline is extended to 30 January 2015, and the joint-status-report deadline is extended to 6 February 2015. All other deadlines in the Final Scheduling Order - including the dispositive motions deadline - remain in effect. The Court reminds the parties that this case is set for trial on 6 April 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/15/2015. (jak)
September 29, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bartlett v. Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giuseppina Bartlett
Represented By: Austin Porter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Arkansas, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?