Dotson v. Sharp
Plaintiff: Antonio L Dotson
Defendant: Shelia Sharp
Case Number: 4:2013cv00731
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT: Dotson's petition is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/29/2015. (jak)
February 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER directing the Petitioner to file, on or before 3/6/2014, a Reply addressing the arguments for dismissal raised in 9 Response to Habeas Petition, filed by Shelia Sharp. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 02/07/2014. (kcs)
January 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Antonio L Dotson. Plaintiff must provide a Certificate of Prisoner Accounts before the Court can determine whether he is eligible to proceed ifp. The Clerk is directed to send p etitioner a blank Certificate of Prisoner Accounts. Petitioner must file within 30 days the completed Certificate of Prisoner Accounts, signed by an authorized officer at the incarcerating facility. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 1/2/14. (kpr)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dotson v. Sharp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio L Dotson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Sharp
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Heil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?