Prince v. Southern Snow Manufacturing Inc

Plaintiff: Samantha Prince
Defendant: Southern Snow Manufacturing Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00031
Filed: January 17, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Yell
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2016 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Costs. The $400.00 filing fee is allowed in full as costs. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/21/2016. (jak)
November 10, 2016 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court authorizes expert, John Hamilton, to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 11/14/2016 - 11/16/2016 for the trial in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/10/2016. (jak)
November 9, 2016 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Mark Andrews and Conrad Odom to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 14-16 November 2016 for the trial in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2016. (jak)
October 20, 2016 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to General Order 54, the Court authorizes Mark Andrews to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse in Little Rock on 10/21/2016 for a hearing in this case. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/20/2016. (jak)
September 2, 2015 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER suspending the Final Scheduling Order, 9 . The 5 October 2015 trial is cancelled. An Amended Final Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/2/2015. (jak)
July 2, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion to Dismiss with a caveat. Prince is free to pursue the claim against the machine's manufacturer. Any renewed motion on personal juridiction - based on the facts established by depositions and affidavits - due by 9 January 2015. Scheduling Orders will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/2/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prince v. Southern Snow Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Prince
Represented By: Timothy James Cullen
Represented By: Conrad Thomas Odom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Snow Manufacturing Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?