Howell v. Hobbs et al

Plaintiff: Robert E Howell, Sr
Defendant: Pierce, Lay and Ray Hobbs
Case Number: 4:2014cv00129
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 25, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 32 Order entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/25/2014. (ks)
June 5, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 14 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's 9 motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is denied. Plaintiff's motion for ruling regarding 13 motion for preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order is denied as moot. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/5/2014. (ks)
May 15, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 12 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Ray Hobbs and Pierce are dismissed from this action for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 5/15/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Howell v. Hobbs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pierce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ray Hobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert E Howell, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?