Kimble v. Eeoff et al

Plaintiff: Walter Antione Kimble , III
Defendant: Cheryl Eeoff, Thelma Emmerson and Mike Smith
Case Number: 4:2014cv00193
Filed: March 27, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Mississippi
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2016 75 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The jury returned a verdict in favor of defendant, Thelma Emerson. Judgment is entered in favor of Thelma Emerson on the claims of Walter Antione Kimble, III. The complaint of Walter Antione Kimble, III, is dismissed with prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this judgment would be frivolous and not in good faith. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 7/27/2016. (ljb)
September 22, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 38 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 23 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's official capacity claims are DISMISSED with prejudice; the Motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/22/2015. (ks)
June 10, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Recommendations in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Cheryl Eeoff and Mike Smith are DISMISSED from this action for plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 6/10/2014. (ks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kimble v. Eeoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Antione Kimble , III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Eeoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thelma Emmerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?