Thompson et al v. DCI Biologicals Little Rock LLC et al

Plaintiff: Lashawn Morgan and Sherri Thompson
Defendant: DCI Biologicals Little Rock LLC and DCI Biologicals Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00294
Filed: May 13, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The 1 Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/15/2014. (jak)
September 9, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER informing that if no party notifies the Court by 16 September 2014 that unsealing the letter and brief and the settlement agreement would mean there is no settlement, the Court will unseal those documents and enter a Judgment dismissing the case with prejudice. The billing records, which contain privileged material and work product, will remain sealed. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/9/2014. (jak)
July 31, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER lifting the stay in this case. The parties must file their proposed agreement, and any billing records for attorney's fees under seal by 8 August 2014. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/31/2014. (jak)
July 29, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Joint Report, 27 , appreciated. Tilley appointed as arbitrator. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/29/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson et al v. DCI Biologicals Little Rock LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCI Biologicals Little Rock LLC
Represented By: Lucy Clippinger(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fellows(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael E. Hale
Represented By: Louis Orbach(Designation Retained)
Represented By: James D. Robertson
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCI Biologicals Inc
Represented By: Lucy Clippinger(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jonathan B. Fellows(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael E. Hale
Represented By: Louis Orbach(Designation Retained)
Represented By: James D. Robertson
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lashawn Morgan
Represented By: Joshua Sanford(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Thompson
Represented By: Joshua Sanford(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Christopher Wesley Burks(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?