Bigge Crane and Rigging Co v. Entergy Operations Inc et al

Plaintiff: Bigge Crane and Rigging Co
Defendant: Entergy Operations Inc and Entergy Arkansas Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00298
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 21, 2015 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 95 Motion to Compel arbitration. Motion to abstain, 82 , granted as modified. Motions about the second amended complaint, 81 & 93 , granted in part and denied in part. Bigge's amended pleading is deferred until further Order. Case stayed. The Court will administratively terminate the case on 27 February 2015. Any party may move thereafter to reopen and lift the stay for good cause. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/21/2015. (jak)
July 10, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to keep the waivers as part of the Court's file. Based on the parties' waivers, I will not recuse. Stay lifted. 85 Motion for Expedited Ruling is granted. 84 Motion to postpone responding to Entergy's motion to dismiss is denied. The briefing scheduled attached hereto should bring some order to the parties' arguments. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/10/2014. (jak)
June 26, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER staying this case until an issue of recusal is determined. The Judge will recuse unless all parties inform the Clerk in writing by 9 July 2014 that they waive any basis for disqualification arising from the telephone call. Do not inform me or my chambers of your client's decision; please communicate only with the Clerk of Court about this. The Clerk will file something of record after all parties have responded to him. Case stayed until further Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 6/26/2014. (jak)
May 13, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 71 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The claim against Siemens Energy, Inc. is DISMISSED without prejudice. Defendant Siemens Energy, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss or Stay the Master Services Agreement Claims (Doc. No. 40 ), and Agree d Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss Claims Against Siemens Under Rule 12(b)(1) (Doc. No. 41 ) are DENIED without prejudice. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court, Eastern District of Arkansas, Western Division. Separate Defendants Entergy Arkansas, Inc.'s and Entergy Operations, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint (Doc. No. 42 ), and Plaintiff Bigge Crane and Rigging Co.'s Motion to Compel Arbitration (Doc. No. 49 ), are DENIED without prejudice to consideration by the United States District Court in Arkansas. The Clerk is directed to CLOSE the file. Signed by Chief Judge Anne C. Conway on 5/13/2014. (SR) [Transferred from flmd on 5/14/2014.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bigge Crane and Rigging Co v. Entergy Operations Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Operations Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Entergy Arkansas Inc
Represented By: John E. Tull, III(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Norris Shannon
Represented By: Steven W. Quattlebaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bigge Crane and Rigging Co
Represented By: Donald Arthur Waltz(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Michael Reed(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Sanjay K. Minocha(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen(Designation Retained)
Represented By: Lawrence T. Bowman(Designation Retained)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?