McCall v. Shock et al

Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Defendant: Shock, Doe and Vincient
Case Number: 4:2014cv00333
Filed: June 3, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Chicot
Referring Judge: Jerome T. Kearney
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 8, 2015 76 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: McCall's claims against the John Doe Defendant are dismissed without prejudice for failure to serve. McCall's claims against Defendants Shock and Vincent are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/8/2015. (jak)
December 8, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 39 Partial Recommended Disposition; denying 35 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/5/2014. (ks)
September 8, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing Defendants to supplement their Response to Plaintiff's 20 Motion to Compel within ten days of the date of the Order, by addressing the following request of Plaintiff: the names of the inmates who were incarcerated in one-man cells with the Plaintiff at the Faulkner County Detention Center. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 9/8/2014. (jak)
July 1, 2014 6 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER FOR PRO SE PRISONERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jerome T. Kearney on 7/1/2014. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCall v. Shock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Shawn McCall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincient
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?