Stevens v. Doe et al

Plaintiff: Jimmy Don Stevens
Defendant: John Doe, Department of Veterans Affairs and Little Rock Police Department
Case Number: 4:2014cv00379
Filed: June 24, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2015 38 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with 37 Order entered on this day, judgment is granted to defendants and this case is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/22/2015. (ljb)
March 10, 2015 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER notifying the parties that 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by USA will be treated as a Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff is directed to file a Response to that Motion within 30 days of the entry of this Order. Failure to timely comply with this Order may result in this case being dismissed, without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 03/10/2015. (kcs)
December 2, 2014 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel; denying 17 Plaintiff's Motion to Amend; denying 19 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff copies of 14 , 15 and 16 along with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 12/02/2014. (kcs)
November 21, 2014 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 14 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's 10 Motion to Compel is DENIED. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/21/2014. (mcz)
October 29, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 8 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants John Does, Department of Veterans Affairs, Little Rock Police Department and Ault are DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to sta te a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's medical treatment claim is construed as a cause of action under the FTCA. The United States of America is added as a Defendant to this action. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from any Order adopting this Partial Disposition would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/29/2014. (mcz)
June 25, 2014 5 Opinion or Order of the Court INITIAL ORDER for pro se prisoners. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 06/25/2014. (kcs)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stevens v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Little Rock Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Don Stevens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?