Webb v. Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Plaintiff: Jeffery Webb
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility, Doc Holiday, Forrest, Brawley and Elliot
Case Number: 4:2014cv00402
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 63 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 10/30/2015. (ks)
January 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS dismissing deft Elliot without prejudice 39 . Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 1/22/15. (tjb)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER adopting 22 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Pulaski Regional Detention Facility, Morgan, and Forrest are DISMISS ED without prejudice. Plaintiff's retaliation claims against Defendant Elliot are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff's deliberate indifference, denial of access to courts, and smoking claims against Defendants Holiday and Smith are DISM ISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff is allowed to proceed with his conditions of confinement claims against Defendants Holiday, Smith, Brawley, and Elliot. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/29/2014. (ks)
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER adopting 7 Proposed Findings and Recommended Partial Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; denying 1 10 Motions for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/26/2014. (ks)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Webb v. Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?