Dawson v. H & H Electric Inc
Plaintiff: Patricia Y Dawson
Defendant: H & H Electric Inc
Case Number: 4:2014cv00583
Filed: September 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: White
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Leslie Cooper and Ria Tabacco Mar are hereby authorized to bring a cell phone, laptop computer, or personal digital assistant into the courthouse on October 5, 2015 and throughout the trial before Judge Susan Webber Wright. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/21/2015. (ks)
September 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 32 OPINION AND ORDER denying 16 Motion for Summary Judgment. The case will proceed to a jury trial. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/15/2015. (ks)
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (wrong case). (jak) (Docket text modified on 7/20/2015.) (thd).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dawson v. H & H Electric Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Y Dawson
Represented By: John L. Burnett
Represented By: Leslie Cooper
Represented By: Ria Tabacco Mar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H & H Electric Inc
Represented By: William P. Dougherty
Represented By: Sam P. Strange, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?