Lewis v. Holladay et al

Plaintiff: Arron Michael Lewis
Defendant: Doc Holladay, Carl Johnson, Sarah Speer, Hazel, Lowe, Mitchell, Allison, Bennett, John Doe and Jane Doe
Case Number: 4:2014cv00673
Filed: November 20, 2014
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Referring Judge: H. David Young
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2015 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 125 pltf's motion for summary judgment is denied 73 ; defts' motion for summary judgment 102 is granted in part and denied in part; pltf's official-capacity claims against defts are dism issed with prejudice; and pltf's individual-capacity claims against defts Holladay, Speer, Hazel, Lowe, Allison, Evans, Mitchell and Stowe are dismissed with prejudice; pltf may proceed with his excessive-force claims against only defts Bennett and Seibel in their individual capacities. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 9/17/15. (tjb)
April 6, 2015 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 44 REPORT AND PARTIAL RECOMMENDATIONS as this Court's findings in all respects in their entirety. Accordingly, Plaintiff's 41 Motion for Injunctive Relief is DENIED. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 04/06/2015. (rhm)
March 20, 2015 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 38 Partial Report and Recommendations. Plaintiff's 32 Motion to Amend and for Service of Process is GRANTED. Mr. Jackman, Mr. Stuart and Ms. Elliott and DISMISSED as Defendants; Vanessa Lowe is re-instated as a defendant; K. Stone is substituted as the new "Jane Doe nurse" for Ms. Elliott; the Clerk of the Court is directed to issue and the United States Marshal is directed to serve, without prepayment of fees or costs or the giving of security a summons and copy of the 3 Amended Complaint on Vanessa Lowe and K. Stone. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 3/20/2015. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Holladay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arron Michael Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carl Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Speer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?