West v. Central Arkansas Library System et al

Plaintiff: Mary Carol West
Defendant: Central Arkansas Library System
Case Number: 4:2015cv00398
Filed: June 30, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 13, 2016 40 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: West's 5 Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/13/2016. (jak)
April 21, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Motion to Compel and denying West's motions, 24 and 29 . The Court directed West to sign the medical authorization, and she did so at the hearing. The Court further directed her to provide the Library a list of all medica l providers (doctors, clinics, hospitals) who diagnosed or treated her disability. The list doesn't have to be perfect, but it should be as complete as West can make it. The list is due by Monday, 25 April 2016. The Library must provide West an electronic copy of all medical records the Library received in response to the authorization. The Library may not disclose West's medical records to anyone and if it wishes to use the records in this lawsuit, then it must file them under seal. A t the end of the case, the Library must either destroy all copies of the records or return them to West. West's exhibit 1 will be filed under seal because it contains some personal medical information. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/21/2016. (jak)
March 31, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on the parties' current discovery dispute at 1:30 p.m. on Tuesday, 19 April 2016. The hearing will be held at the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock Arkansa s, 72201 in courtroom B155. The Court would appreciate the Library filing a copy of the transcript of West's deposition by 8 April 2016. The Court also reminds West of her obligation to keep her contact information current. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2016. (jak)
February 24, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Status report, 22 , noted and appreciated. The Library must respond to West's requests by 24 March 2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/24/2016. (jak)
February 9, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion to Compel. West must review the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, and maker her complete initial disclosures to the Library, by 15 February 2016. The Court cautions West: she must follow the Federal Rules of Civil Procedu re and the Court's Local Rules. The Court directs West and the Library's lawyer to meet and confer on 18 February 2016, after West's deposition, and resolve any remaining discovery disputes. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/9/2016. (jak)
September 28, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: West may request discovery from the defendant after the parties have their Rule 26(f) conference. To the extent No. 11 is a motion, it's denied. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/28/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Central Arkansas Library System et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Carol West
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Arkansas Library System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?