Meinke v. Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Plaintiff: Matt Meinke
Defendant: Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Case Number: 4:2015cv00448
Filed: July 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 1/10/2017. (jak)
November 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Set Aside Default. The Court vacates the Clerk's default, 9 , and the default judgment on liability, 12 . Southern Paramedic must answer or file a Rule 12(b) motion by 4 December 2015. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/23/2015. (jak)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting 3 Motion for Default Judgment. Meinke is entitled to judgment on liability. Damages aren't certain, A hearing will be required. An amended scheduling order with deadlines concerning the hearing will issue. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2015. (jak)
October 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Unless Southern moves to set aside the Clerk's default, or otherwise responds by 23 October 2015, the Court will grant Meinke's motion and set a damages hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/13/2015. (jak)
September 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting 7 Motion to Strike. The Court directs the Clerk to enter a default. Southern Paramedic must respond to the motion for a default judgment, move to set aside the default, and move to file a belated answer (attaching its proposed pleading) if the company wants to defend on liability, which it seems it does. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/10/2015. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meinke v. Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matt Meinke
Represented By: Lloyd W. Kitchens, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Paramedic Services Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?