Beman v. Faulkner County Detention Center

Plaintiff: Christopher Ray Beman
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Case Number: 4:2015cv00591
Filed: September 22, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Hot Spring
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 73 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Beman's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
May 13, 2016 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Unopposed partial recommendation, 44 , adopted. Beman's motion for summary judgment, 43 , is denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/13/2016. (jak)
November 17, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 6 the unopposed partial recommendation; and dismissing, with prejudice, Beman's claims against the Faulkner County Detention Center. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/17/2015. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beman v. Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ray Beman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faulkner County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?