Arnold v. St Vincent Health

Plaintiff: Nolita C U Arnold
Defendant: St Vincent Health
Case Number: 4:2015cv00599
Filed: September 24, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 3, 2015 13 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Arnold's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2015. (jak)
November 18, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 8 Motion for Recusal. Ms. Arnold's deadline for filing an amended complaint was 13 November 2015. She has not done so, and the deadline has passed. In the circumstances, the Court extends her deadline until 2 December 2015. If an amended complaint is not filed clarifying Ms. Arnold's claims by that date, the Court will dismiss her case without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/18/2015. (jak)
November 9, 2015 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court will hold a hearing on Arnold's recusal motion, 8 , on Wednesday, 18 November 2015, at 9:30 a.m. in Room B155 in the Richard Sheppard Arnold United States Courthouse, 500 West Capitol Avenue, Little Rock, Arkansas 72201. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/9/2015. (jak)
October 22, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Arnold's 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Arnold's motion for appointment of counsel, 3 , is denied without prejudice. Arnold is directed to file an amended complaint by 13 November 2015 clarifying the points raised within this Order and stating how St. Vincent violated the law. If she does not, her case will be dismissed without prejudice. If she files an amended complaint, the Court will screen it and consider service. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/22/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold v. St Vincent Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nolita C U Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Vincent Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?