Desalvo v. Eoff et al

Plaintiff: Jamie D Desalvo
Defendant: Randall Eoff and Miachel Hardy
Case Number: 4:2015cv00618
Filed: October 5, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Conway
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2015 25 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Consistent with the 24 Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 12/29/2015. (ks)
November 2, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects in its entirety. Mr. DeSalvo's claims against Defendants Eoff and Hardy in their official capacities are DISMISSED, without prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 11/2/2015. (ks)
October 7, 2015 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to prepare summonses for Defendants Eoff and Hardy. The U.S. Marshal is directed to serve the copies of the Complaint, with any attachments, and a summons for the Defendants without requiring prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 10/7/2015. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Desalvo v. Eoff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie D Desalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Eoff
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miachel Hardy
Represented By: Thomas J. Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?