Neely v. Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility

Plaintiff: James Neely
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2015cv00708
Filed: November 16, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Referring Judge: Patricia S. Harris
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 18, 2017 54 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Based on the 53 Order filed on this date, judgment is entered dismissing this case without prejudice. The relief sought is denied. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 5/18/2017. (mef)
April 28, 2016 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 24 the Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Patricia S. Harris; plaintiff's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 4/28/16. (tjb)
February 18, 2016 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting 11 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Plaintiff's claims against the Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 02/18/2016. (rhm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neely v. Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Neely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?