Ortiz v. Petrovski et al

Plaintiff: Andrew Ortiz
Defendant: Miki Petrovski, Maktrans Logistics Inc and John Does
Case Number: 4:2015cv00747
Filed: December 8, 2015
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 6, 2016 26 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/6/2016. (jak)
March 11, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Notice of voluntary dismissal, 17 , noted. Ortiz's claims against Miki Petrovski are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/11/2016. (jak)
March 10, 2016 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion. For good cause, the Court sets aside the default against Maktrans Logistics. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/10/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Petrovski et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Ortiz
Represented By: Brett A. McDaniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miki Petrovski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maktrans Logistics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?