Wofford v. Holladay et al
Plaintiff: Ricky Wofford, Jr
Defendant: Doc Holladay, Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility, Bennett, Allen, J Smith, Mitchell, Landreth, Ouzit, Trammell and Brawley
Case Number: 4:2016cv00143
Filed: March 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Chicot
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 JUDGMENT: Consistent with the Order that was entered on this day, it is considered, ordered, and adjudged that this case is dismissed with prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), than an in forma pauperis appeal form this Judgment and the corresponding Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/17/2017. (mef)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER approving and adopting 36 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Defendant J. Smith; and certifying pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3) that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/14/2016. (mef)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that Plaintiff should provide a viable address at which service for Defendant J. Smith may be attempted within 15 days of this order's entry. If he fails to do so, the Court will recommend Defendant Smith's dismissal without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 5/3/2016. (lej)
April 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER adopting the partial recommended disposition of United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe 8 ; plaintiff's claims against defendants Doc Holladay, Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility, Bennett, Allen, Trammel and Brawley are dismissed without prejudice for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted; the Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/21/16. (tjb)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing the Clerk to prepare summons and the USM to serve Defendants Ouzit, Smith, Mitchell, and Landreth without prepayment of fees or costs or security therefore. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe on 4/4/2016. (lej)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wofford v. Holladay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Wofford, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holladay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Regional Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Landreth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ouzit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trammell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brawley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?