Peel v. Jackson County Sheriff Department et al

Plaintiff: Debra Peel
Defendant: Jackson County Sheriff Department, Arkansas Department of Correction, David Lucas, Jones, Akens and McCoy
Case Number: 4:2016cv00224
Filed: April 26, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M. Moody
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2017 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL granting 86 motion to dismiss. The Complaint and all claims against the Defendants are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 9/27/2017. (cmn)
August 21, 2017 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 79 Proposed Findings and Recommendations that the Clerk amend the docket to reflect Defendant Melanie Jones-Foster's full name; that Defendant Jones's 71 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted and Plaintiff's c laims against Defendant Jones are dismissed with prejudice; and that Defendant Jones' 77 Motion to Dismiss is also granted. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 8/21/2017. (mcz)
April 6, 2017 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 57 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition. Defendants' 55 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Defendants Lucas and Smith are dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915 (a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 4/6/2017. (mcz)
January 31, 2017 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 45 Partial Report and Recommendations. Defendant McCoy's 40 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted and Defendant McCoy is dismissed without prejudice. The Court certifies that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/31/2017. (mcz)
October 25, 2016 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING 32 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in all respects, except for the recommendation to dismiss Defendant Doe. The Court will allow Plaintiff's appointed attorney additional time to determine the identity o f Defendant Doe if possible. Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Aikens are dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk shall amend the docket sheet to correct Defendant's name as Deputy Warden Tami J. Aikens. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a)(3), that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 10/25/2016. (mcz)
July 13, 2016 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER approving and adopting in their entirety the 18 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects. Defendants Jackson County Sheriff Department, Arkansas Department of Correction, and Newport Fire Department are dismissed with prejudice from this action. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 7/13/2016. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peel v. Jackson County Sheriff Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Peel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jackson County Sheriff Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Department of Correction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lucas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?