Hamilton v. Foster et al

Plaintiff: Ted Hamilton
Defendant: Melanie Jones Foster and Rory L Griffin
Case Number: 4:2016cv00243
Filed: May 5, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Izard
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Referring Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 25, 2017 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in their entirety 49 the proposed findings and recommendations; dismissing plaintiff Ted Hamilton's claim against defendant Melanie Jones Foster in her official capacity; granting 46 Jones Foster's motion or summary judgm ent as to Hamilton's claim against her in her personal capacity ; dismissing this case, with prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from the order and judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 7/25/2017. (kdr)
August 12, 2016 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the 24 Partial Report and Recommendations submitted by United States Magistrate Judge Joe J. Volpe denying 14 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/12/16. (tjb)
June 7, 2016 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 4 the proposed findings and partial recommended disposition; and dismissing, with prejudice, defendant Rory Griffin; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 6/7/2016. (kdr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Foster et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ted Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Jones Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory L Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?