State Farm Fire and Casualty v. Omega Flex Inc

Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty
Defendant: Omega Flex Inc
Case Number: 4:2016cv00387
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 23, 2018 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this action is dismissed with prejudice as to all claims by the plaintiff and all claims by the defendant that were or could have been asserted, with all costs to be borne by the party incurring those costs. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 3/23/2018. (cmn)
February 1, 2018 83 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 56 Omega Flex, Inc.'s motion to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Mark Goodson; denying 60 Omega Flex, Inc.'s motion to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Charles Ke ller Colwell, Johnie P. Spruiell, and Mark C. Hergenrether; denying 58 Omega Flex, Inc.'s motion to exclude certain opinions and testimony of Dr. Elizabeth Buc; and denying 51 Omega Flex, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment on the plaintiff's failure-to-warn claims. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/1/2018. (ljb)
December 12, 2017 49 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying the 42 motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Kytomaa. This is a definitive ruling. The 43 motion to exclude the testimony of Dr. Wagenhofer is also denied. This is not a definitive ruling. The Court will reconsider the issue after State Farm concludes its case-in-chief at trial. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 12/12/2017. (ljb)
February 3, 2017 30 Opinion or Order of the Court OPINION AND ORDER denying Omega Flex's 17 motion to compel; denying State Farm's 20 motion to compel defendant's responses to written discovery; denying State Farm's 22 motion to compel witness depositions; granting in part and denying in part Omega Flex's 27 cross motion for protective order; and denying an award of attorneys' fees requested by both parties. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 2/3/2017. (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty v. Omega Flex Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty
Represented By: Craig Michael Schumacher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex Inc
Represented By: Breana Ott Mackey
Represented By: James D. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?