Evans v. McLarty NLRN LLC et al
Plaintiff: Evans and Ashley Evans
Defendant: McLarty NLRN LLC, Asbury AR Niss LLC, Nissan Extended Services North America Inc, Fifth Third Bank, McLarty NLRN LLC doing business as McLarty of North Little Rock doing business as North Little Rock Nissan and Asbury AR Niss LLC doing business as North Little Rock Nissan
Case Number: 4:2016cv00628
Filed: August 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lonoke
Presiding Judge: J Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting plaintiff's #24 motion to reopen case and to dismiss with prejudice. This case was administratively terminated on 11/18/2016, and is now reopened. This action is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 4/20/2017. (ljb)
April 19, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Reopen Case and Dismiss with Prejudice by Ashley Evans (McGaha, Corey)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION AND ORDER granting the #15 motion to compel arbitration. This action is administratively terminated pending the outcome of arbitration. The parties are directed to submit claims of Ashley Evans against North Little Rock Nissan and Fifth Third Bank to arbitration in accordance with the terms of the agreement. Any party may move to reopen this action within 30 days after the arbitration issues a final decision. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/18/2016. (ljb)
November 14, 2016 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #21 Reply to Response to Motion. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to indicate the docket entry was filed in error. The correct document was filed as docket entry #22 Reply to Response to Motion re #15 Motion to Compel. (jak)
November 11, 2016 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Asbury AR Niss LLC, Fifth Third Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Reply in Support of Motion to Compel Arbitration)(Young, Regina)
November 11, 2016 Filing 21 DOCKET ENTRY FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD (Young, Regina) (Docket text modified on 11/14/2016 to indicate the docket entry was filed in error).(jak)
November 7, 2016 Filing 20 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 12/28/2016. Rule 26(f) Report due by 1/11/2017. Proposed jury trial date the week of 10/30/2017 in Little Rock before Judge J. Leon Holmes. Signed at the direction of the Court. (cdw)
November 4, 2016 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Ashley Evans. (McGaha, Corey)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting Plaintiff Ashley Evans' #17 Motion to Extend Time to File Opposition to Motion to Compel Arbitration. Plaintiff shall have up to and including 11/8/2016, to file her opposition to the pending #15 motion to compel arbitration. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 10/25/2016. (ljb)
October 25, 2016 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Ashley Evans (McGaha, Corey)
October 11, 2016 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Asbury AR Niss LLC. (Young, Regina)
October 11, 2016 Filing 15 MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Asbury AR Niss LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Waiver of Purchaser's Right to Sue)(Young, Regina)
October 11, 2016 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Asbury AR Niss LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Retail Purchase Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Buyers Guide, #3 Exhibit C - Waiver of Purchaser's Right to Sue)(Young, Regina)
October 3, 2016 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Amended Complaint , filed by Ashley Evans. Asbury AR Niss LLC served on 10/3/2016. (McGaha, Corey)
September 29, 2016 Filing 12 Original ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan Extended Services North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 21, 2016 Filing 11 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by Fifth Third Bank.(Young, Regina)
September 8, 2016 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all Defendants filed by Ashley Evans. Summons Issued to Asbury AR Niss LLC and returned to counsel for service.(fjg) (Docket text modified to correct a typographical error.)
September 7, 2016 Filing 9 Original ANSWER to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand by Nissan Extended Services North America Inc.(Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S. Patterson on behalf of Nissan Extended Services North America Inc (Patterson, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting plaintiff's #5 unopposed motion for leave to file amended complaint and to dismiss defendant. Plaintiff's amended complaint must be filed within seven days from the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/6/2016. (ljb)
September 6, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #5 Motion. CORRECTION: The original document was submitted in error (lack of case number). The corrected document was added to docket entry #5 and is attached hereto for review by the parties. (jak)
September 2, 2016 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION to Dismiss Party McLarty NLRN, LLC d/b/a McLarty Nissan of North Little Rock and d/b/a North Little Rock Nissan and for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Ashley Evans (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Proposed Amended Complaint)(McGaha, Corey) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/6/2016: #2 Main Document - Correct (submitted 9/6/2016)) (jak).
August 31, 2016 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Fifth Third Bank.(Young, Regina)
August 31, 2016 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Ann Young on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Young, Regina)
August 30, 2016 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Ashley Evans. (ljb)
August 30, 2016 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Fifth Third Bank from Lonoke County Circuit Court, Case Number 43CV-16-450. Fee $400 paid, Receipt #LIT058167. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ljb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. McLarty NLRN LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarty NLRN LLC
Represented By: Bryan W. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury AR Niss LLC
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan Extended Services North America Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: Gary D. Marts, Jr.
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McLarty NLRN LLC doing business as McLarty of North Little Rock doing business as North Little Rock Nissan
Represented By: Bryan W. Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asbury AR Niss LLC doing business as North Little Rock Nissan
Represented By: Regina Ann Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Evans
Represented By: William Thomas Crowder
Represented By: Corey Darnell McGaha
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?