Bilal v. Progressive Home Owners & Auto Insurance Company et al

Plaintiff: Kasib Tauheed Bilal
Defendant: Progressive Home Owners & Auto Insurance Company and Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance
Case Number: 4:2016cv00675
Filed: September 27, 2016
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2017 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting as modified 22 Motion for Summary Judgment. Progressive is dismissed without prejudice and the proper defendant, IDS Property Casualty Insurance Company is substituted in. The Court directs the Clerk to update the docket. 26 Motion to Appoint Counsel is denied. By 4/28/2017, each party must produce to the other party copies of all material records in its possession about this dispute. By 5/26/2017 the parties must exchange written requests for any additional discovery. 27 Mo tion is denied. Bilal should familiarize himself with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Local Rules, and in particular with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56 and corresponding Local Rule 56.1. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/28/2017. (jak)
February 3, 2017 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court notes Bilal's payment over time of the filing fee in full. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/3/2017. (jak)
November 2, 2016 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the Clerk to issue summons to Progressive. The Court directs the U.S. Marshal to serve the complaint and summons by certified mail, restricted delivery, with a return receipt requested, without prepayment of fees, to Progressive's President. All claims against Ameriprise are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 11/2/2016. (jak)
October 14, 2016 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. Bilal must pay $100 on the first day of every month, beginning 11/1/2016, until the total $400 fee is paid in full. Bilal's complaint does state a claim under 42 U.S.C. 1981 for u nequal treatment based on race in a contractual relationship. That one claim goes forward. Bilal's embedded request for a lawyer, 2 at 3, is denied without prejudice. The Court directs Bilal to provide the names and addresses of the registered agents for Progressive and Ameriprise by 11/1/2016. Bilal must familiarize himself with this Court's Local Rules and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the complaint will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/14/2016. (jak)
September 29, 2016 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court needs more information before it can rule on the 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Plaintiff is directed to answer the questions contained within this order by 10/7/2016. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 9/29/2016. (jak)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bilal v. Progressive Home Owners & Auto Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kasib Tauheed Bilal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Home Owners & Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ameriprise Auto & Home Insurance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?