Coleman v. Holliday et al
Plaintiff: Alex Coleman
Defendant: Doc Holliday and Pulaski County Detention Facility
Case Number: 4:2016cv00759
Filed: October 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: J. Thomas Ray
Presiding Judge: Billy Roy Wilson
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 JUDGMENT: Consistent with 46 Order entered today, judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. All relief sought is denied, and this case is closed. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 8/29/2018. (ljb)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 JUDGMENT: Based on the 34 Order entered today, this case is dismissed without prejudice. An in forma pauperis appeal would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 11/13/2017. (cmn)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving and adopting 7 Recommendation; dismissing Coleman's claims against the Pulaski County Detention Center with prejudice; dismissing his access to courts, inhumane conditions of confinement, and equal protection claims against all other defendants without prejudice; certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal of these rulings would not be taken in good faith; directing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Holliday, McGee, Robinson, Hodges, and Turner; and directing the US Marsh al to serve the summons, 2 complaint, 5 amended complaint, and this order on them without prepayment of fees and costs or security. If the defendants are no longer Pulaski County employees, the individual responding to service must file a sealed statement providing the unserved defendant's last known private mailing address. Signed by Judge Billy Roy Wilson on 12/30/2016. (rhm)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coleman v. Holliday et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doc Holliday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pulaski County Detention Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?