Hannibal et al v. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Chris Hannibal and Leanna Hannibal
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2016cv00904
Filed: December 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Saline
Presiding Judge: J. Leon Holmes
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 151 OPINION AND ORDER denying 145 motion for new trial. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 11/13/2018. (ljb)
September 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 142 JUDGMENT entered in favor of TRW Vehicle Safety Systems, Inc., against Chris Hannibal and Leanna Castillo, Individually and as Co-Personal Representatives of the Estate of Krista Sue Hannibal, Deceased. The complaint of the plaintiff is hereby dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 9/20/2018. (ljb)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 OPINION AND ORDER denying 49 TRW's motion to exclude the testimony of expert Steven Meyer; denying 46 TRW's motion for summary judgment on product liability claims; denying 45 plaintiffs' motion to exclude testimony of the defen dant's experts; granting 37 TRW's motion to exclude the loss of life testimony of Dr. Rebecca Summary; denying 39 TRW's motion to exclude James Chamberlin's seatbelt statements; and denying 41 TRW's motion for summary judgment on alleged conscious pain and suffering damages. Signed by Judge J. Leon Holmes on 8/9/2018. (ljb)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannibal et al v. TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Hannibal
Represented By: Clyde Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leanna Hannibal
Represented By: Clyde Tab Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TRW Vehicle Safety Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?