Jones v. Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc
Plaintiff: Jones and Coretha Jones
Defendant: Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc
Case Number: 4:2016cv00932
Filed: December 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: James M Moody
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 1/18/2018. (mcz)
January 3, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Coretha Jones (Campbell, Sheila)
October 20, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service , filed by Coretha Jones. Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc served on 1/5/2017. (Campbell, Sheila)
April 12, 2017 Filing 7 FINAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 6/4/2018 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Discovery due by 3/6/2018; Motions due by 3/26/2018; Pretrial Disclosure Sheet due by 5/4/2018; Status Report due by 4/5/2018. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/12/2017. (kog)
April 6, 2017 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc. (Wakefield, Samuel)
February 8, 2017 Filing 5 INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/27/2017; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/10/2017. Proposed Jury Trial set sometime during the week of 3/12/2018 at 9:15 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 4A before Judge James M. Moody Jr. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 2/8/2017. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Final Scheduling Order)(kog)
January 17, 2017 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc (Wakefield, Samuel)
January 17, 2017 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc.(Wakefield, Samuel)
January 17, 2017 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Brent Wakefield on behalf of Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc (Wakefield, Samuel)
December 30, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc ( Fee $ 400. Receipt Number LIT059860.), filed by Coretha Jones. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coretha Jones
Represented By: Sheila F. Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Enterprises for the Developmentally Disabled Inc
Represented By: Samuel Brent Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?