Wilson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lisa J Wilson
Defendant: Brian Stacy Miller, Anthony Guerra, Leanne Elliott, G Edward Towe, James Duff, Hallie Yates and Rebecca Howell
Case Number: 4:2017cv00060
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER in accordance with the Memorandum and Order entered today, it is hereby ordered that this matter is dismissed. Signed by Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/29/2017. (jak)
March 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER in accordance with the 38 Memorandum and Order, Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed as to defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. Signed by Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr. on 3/3/2017. (jak)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT EQUIFAX INFORMATION SERVICES LLC'S MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL. 33 Motion granted. The Clerk is ordered to enter the appearances of Roger D. Rowe and Ralph D. Scott III for Defendant Equifax, and to terminate the appearance of Brian R. Meiners for Defendant Equifax. Signed by Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/28/2017. (jak)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER of Recusal. The Clerk must reassign this case at random by chip exchange. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 2/6/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa J Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Stacy Miller
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Guerra
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leanne Elliott
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Edward Towe
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Duff
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hallie Yates
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Howell
Represented By: Stacey Elise McCord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?