Lee et al v. Hutchinson et al
Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson, Wendy Kelley, John Felts, John Belken, Andy Shock, Dawne Benafield Vandiver, Jerry Riley, Abraham Carpenter, Jr and Lona H McCastlain
Consol_plaintiff: Marcel Williams, Kenneth Williams, Jason McGehee and Stacey Johnson
Intervenor: Jack Harold Jones, Jr
Case Number: 4:2017cv00194
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 JUDGMENT: The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 10/16/2017. (jak)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER: The Court has received and appreciates the notice, No. 75 , of Governor Hutchison's action. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/30/2017. (jak)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER: The parties have reported on the record that Ledell Lee, Marcel Williams, Kenneth Williams, and Jack Jones are deceased. Their deaths have mooted their claims. And all those claims are therefore dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/14/2017. (jak)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER: The Court would benefit from a joint status report. Please confer and file the joint report by 8/11/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/26/2017. (jak)
April 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 62 Williams' amended motion for a preliminary injunction stopping his execution. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/27/2017. (thd)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER: Lee's 49 Amended Motion for a preliminary injunction is denied. The State Defendants' 51 Motion to Strike is denied too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/20/2017. (jak)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER: Expedited response to the 51 Motion to Strike due as soon as practicable or by 5:00 p.m. today, 4/19/2017. The State Defendants should still file a response on the merits of Lee's latest motion by that time too. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/19/2017. (jak)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 40 Amended MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/18/2017. (jak)
April 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER: The Court would appreciate an expedited response to Marcel Williams's amended 40 Motion for preliminary injunction. Abbreviated papers are acceptable. Response due by 5:00 p.m. on Monday, 17 April 2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/14/2017. (jak)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Intervene and 15 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis. The Court defers assessment of the filing fee, and refers the fee issue to Magistrate Judge Ray to decide in due course. The 19 & 20 Motions to Dismiss are part ly granted and partly denied. All of Bruce Ward's claims are dismissed without prejudice for lack of standing. He's no longer a party. The 3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is partly granted, partly denied, and held in abeyance as to J ones. When the Board gives public notice of its recommendation about Jones, the Board Defendants must also notify this Court. The Court stays Jason McGehee's execution and enjoins Governor Asa Hutchinson and Arkansas Department of Correction Dir ector Wendy Kelley from carrying out McGehee's death sentence until the Arkansas Parole Board complies with Ark. Code Ann.§ 16-93-204(e) and until Governor Hutchinson acts on the Board's recommendation. In due course, the Board Defenda nts must file notice of statutory compliance. Thereafter, whenever the Governor exercises his discretion and acts on the Board's merit recommendation about McGehee, the Governor must file notice of his decision.Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/6/2017.(jak)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: Any attending member of the media may bring a tape recorder into the courthouse for the April 5th hearing. The use of any such recording, however, shall be limited by and subject to Local Rule 83.2(d). The same limitation applies to recordings from the April 4th hearing. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 4/5/2017. (jak)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: For the reasons stated on the record at today's telephone conference, the 12 Motion to quash is granted, and the 7 Motion for discovery on an expedited basis is partly granted and mostly denied. Responses to approved discovery due by 10:00 a.m. on 4/3/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/31/2017. (jak)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER consolidating these cases and granting 1 Motion to proceed in forma pauperis in all six cases. The Court defers assessment of the filing fee and refers those issues to Magistrate Judge Kearney to handle in due course. The Court directs the Cl erk to eliminate the Board and the ADC as defendants. The Court directs the Clerk to issue summonses and forward them to plaintiffs' counsel to serve the complaint on the remaining defendants. Defendants should respond to the complaint and the m otion as soon as practicable - and no later than noon on Monday, 4/3/2017. An evidentiary hearing will be held on 4/4/2017 starting at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 2A. By the close of business Monday, counsel should exchange exhibits, exhibit lists, and witness lists (with copies to the Court). Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 3/30/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee et al v. Hutchinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Represented By: Scott W. Braden
Represented By: Lee Deken Short
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asa Hutchinson
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Felts
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Belken
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Shock
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dawne Benafield Vandiver
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerry Riley
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham Carpenter, Jr
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lona H McCastlain
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Represented By: Gary L. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Marcel Williams
Represented By: Scott W. Braden
Represented By: Jamie Giani
Represented By: Julie Pitt Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Kenneth Williams
Represented By: James H. Moreno
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Jason McGehee
Represented By: Scott W. Braden
Represented By: Jamie Giani
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Represented By: Julie Pitt Vandiver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol_plaintiff: Stacey Johnson
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Jack Harold Jones, Jr
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Rosenzweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?