Lee v. Jegley et al
Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Defendant: Larry Jegley, Geoffrey Herweg, William J Bryant and Wendy Kelley
Case Number: 4:2017cv00256
Filed: April 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 JUDGMENT: Lee's complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/23/2017. (jak)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: There's been no activity on the docket since mid-May. In the circumstances, the Court will dismiss the complaint without prejudice for failure to prosecute unless some party requests some other action by 8/11/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 7/27/2017. (jak)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: The Court would appreciate a status report by 5/17/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 5/3/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Jegley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ledell Lee
Represented By: Nina Morrison
Represented By: Lee Deken Short
Represented By: Cassandra Stubbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey Herweg
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William J Bryant
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Kelley
Represented By: Colin R. Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?