Ellington v. Flowers et al
Plaintiff: Khalan Ellington
Defendant: Lacretia Flowers, Billy Kelly and Gary Andrews
Case Number: 4:2017cv00259
Filed: April 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Faulkner
Presiding Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT : Consistent with 49 Order, this case is dismissed, with prejudice. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 2/20/2018. (cmn)
May 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting 10 motion for joinder; instructing the Clerk to add Lieutenant Andrews as a Defendant and to file Mr. Ellington's 10 motion as an addendum to his complaint; instructing the Clerk to prepare a summons for Defendant Andrews through the Faulkner County Detention Center, Unit 1; and directing the U.S. Marshal to serve a copy of the complaint and the addendum to the complaint, together with attachments, and a summons for Defendant Andrews without prepayment of fees and costs or security. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth Deere on 5/10/2017. (mef)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER approving and adopting the 5 Partial Recommended Disposition as this Court's findings in all respects; dismissing without prejudice Mr. Ellington's claims against Defendant Rice; and dismissing without prejudice claims against Defendants Flowers and Kelly in their official capacities. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 5/5/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ellington v. Flowers et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khalan Ellington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lacretia Flowers
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Billy Kelly
Represented By: Kaylen Suzanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?