McAlphin v. Wade et al
Plaintiff: James McAlphin
Defendant: Brenda Wade, Arkansas Claims Commission and Does
Case Number: 4:2017cv00343
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Lincoln
Presiding Judge: Joe J. Volpe
Presiding Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER approving and adopting 34 the Proposed Findings and Recommended Disposition; granting 28 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; dismissing Plaintiff's case with prejudice; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order and the accompanying Judgment would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 4/23/2018. (kdr)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER adopting Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; and dismissing without prejudice Plaintiff's claims against all Doe Defendants. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 9/27/2017. (cmn)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER approving and adopting the 16 Proposed Findings and Partial Recommended Disposition in their entirety as this Court's findings in all respects; granting in part and denying in part 9 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss; dismissing wit hout prejudice Plaintiff's claims for compensatory and punitive damages based on Defendants' quasi-judicial and sovereign immunities and denying Defendant's Motion to Dismiss in all other respects; and certifying that an in forma pauperis appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Judge Susan Webber Wright on 8/14/2017. (mef)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McAlphin v. Wade et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James McAlphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Wade
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arkansas Claims Commission
Represented By: Vincent P. France
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?