Hopkins v. Jegley et al
Plaintiff: Frederick W Hopkins
Defendant: Larry Jegley, Steven L Cathey, Robert Breving, Jr, Bob E Cogburn, William F Dudding, Omar T Atiq, Veryl D Hodges, Marie Holder, Larry D Lovell, William L Rutledge, John H Scribner, Sylvia D Simon, David L Staggs and John B Weiss
Case Number: 4:2017cv00404
Filed: June 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: Kristine G. Baker
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER denying 99 defendants' motion to stay preliminary injunction pending appeal and for a temporary administrative stay, to the extent the Court retains jurisdiction over these matters. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/25/2021. (jbh)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER AFTER REMAND denying 75 motion to strike plaintiffs' motion for a second preliminary injunction and request for expedited consideration; granting 73 motion for a second preliminary injunction, as modified by the terms of this Order; preliminarily enjoining defendants, and all those acting in concert with them, from enforcing the requirements listed in this Order; and enjoining defendants from failing to notify immediately all state officials responsible for enforcing these requirements about the existence and requirements of this preliminary injunction. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 65(b)(2), this preliminary injunction remains in effect until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/5/2021. (jbh)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AFTER REMAND granting 69 Dr. Hopkins and LRFP's motion for temporary restraining order as set forth in this Order. This temporary restraining order shall not exceed 14 days from the date of entry of this Order and shall expire by its own terms on Tuesday 1/5/2021 at 5:00 p.m. unless the Court extends it. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 12/22/2020. (thd)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER: The Court determines that Dr. Hopkins has met his burden for the issuance of preliminary injunctions for the challenged Mandates. Therefore, the Court grants Dr. Hopkins's 2 Motion for preliminary injunction. Furt her, Defendants are enjoined from failing to notify immediately all state officials responsible for enforcing these requirements, about the existence and requirements of this preliminary injunction. This preliminary injunction remains in effect until further order from this Court. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 7/28/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Jegley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick W Hopkins
Represented By: Bettina E. Brownstein
Represented By: Susan Talcott Camp
Represented By: Ruth E. Harlow
Represented By: Hillary A. Schneller
Represented By: Elizabeth K. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Jegley
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven L Cathey
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Breving, Jr
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob E Cogburn
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William F Dudding
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omar T Atiq
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veryl D Hodges
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Holder
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry D Lovell
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L Rutledge
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H Scribner
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia D Simon
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David L Staggs
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John B Weiss
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Nicholas Jacob Bronni
Represented By: Michael Cantrell
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?