Thomas v. Southern Bancorp Bank
Plaintiff: Christopher Berry Thomas
Defendant: Southern Bancorp Bank
Case Number: 4:2017cv00497
Filed: August 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Presiding Judge: D. P. Marshall
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 JUDGMENT: Thomas's amended complaint is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 12/3/2019. (jak)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER denying 29 Motion for Summary Judgment. A Third Amended Final Scheduling Order setting a new trial date will issue. Signed by Chief Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/20/2019. (jak)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: The Court notes the 1 Complaint. Unless the Court has missed something, the amount in controversy is uncertain. Please file an amended complaint that clarifies subject matter jurisdiction by 8/25/2017. Signed by Judge D. P. Marshall Jr. on 8/15/2017. (jak)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Southern Bancorp Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Berry Thomas
Represented By: Judson C. Kidd
Represented By: Catherine A. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern Bancorp Bank
Represented By: Adrienne L. Baker
Represented By: Rodney P. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?