107 Liquor Inc et al v. Casteel et al
Plaintiff: 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC, Deborah W Goolsby and Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC
Defendant: Mary Robin Casteel, Jean Hervey, Steven Smith, Thomas Powell, Jr, Daniel Greenberg and Jamie Anderson
Case Number: 4:2017cv00710
Filed: October 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Arkansas
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Pulaski
Presiding Judge: Brian S Miller
Referring Judge: Susan Webber Wright
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2017 Filing 28 Letter to Pulaski County Circuit Clerk forwarding case file pursuant to remand. (mcz)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER denying plaintiffs' #14 Motion for a preliminary injunction. Plaintiffs' 14th Amendment Equal Protection claim is dismissed, and this case is remanded. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/14/2017. (mcz)
November 13, 2017 Filing 26 Witness List by Jamie Anderson, Mary Robin Casteel, Daniel Greenberg, Jean Hervey, Thomas Powell, Jr, Steven Smith. (lc)
November 13, 2017 Filing 25 Witness List by 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC, Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby. (lc)
November 13, 2017 Filing 24 Exhibit List by 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC, Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby.(lc)
November 13, 2017 Filing 23 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller: Motion Hearing held on 11/13/2017 re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Witness testimony of John Akins, John Crow, and Debbie Goolsby on behalf of plaintiffs. Witnesss testimony of Mary Robin Casteel on behalf of defendants. Plaintiffs' exhibits 1-3 admitted. An order will follow. Paul James and Deborah Riordan present for the plaintiffs. Jennifer Merritt and Monty Baugh present for the defendants. Joseph Price present for the proposed intervenors. (Court Reporter Judy Ammons.) (lc)
November 13, 2017 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Supplemental Response in Opposition filed by Hays Food Town Inc, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Sam's West Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 4)(Price, Joseph)
November 13, 2017 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by All Defendants. (Merritt, Jennifer)
November 13, 2017 Filing 20 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Jamie Anderson, Mary Robin Casteel, Daniel Greenberg, Jean Hervey, Thomas Powell, Jr, Steven Smith.(Merritt, Jennifer)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER holding in abeyance #10 #12 #15 the motions to intervene submitted by Kroger Limited Partnership; Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC; Sam's West Inc; and Hays Food Town, Inc., to give the parties an opportunity to be heard at the preliminary injunction hearing on 11/13/20017; and directing the proposed intervenors to appear at the hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 11/9/2017. (kdr)
November 9, 2017 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon B. Cate on behalf of Hays Food Town Inc, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Sam's West Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC (Cate, Brandon)
November 9, 2017 Filing 17 PROPOSED INTERVENORS' Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion re #14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Hays Food Town Inc, Kroger Limited Partnership I, Sam's West Inc, Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC. (jap) (Docket text modified on 11/13/2017 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
November 9, 2017 Filing 16 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #15 Motion to Intervene filed by Hays Food Town Inc. (jap)
November 9, 2017 Filing 15 MOTION to Intervene by Hays Food Town Inc (jap)
November 9, 2017 Filing 14 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(James, Paul)
November 8, 2017 Filing 13 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 Motion to Intervene filed by Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC, Sam's West Inc. (fjg)
November 8, 2017 Filing 12 MOTION to Intervene filed by Wal-Mart Stores Arkansas LLC, Sam's West Inc. (fjg)
November 8, 2017 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 Motion to Intervene filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (fjg)
November 8, 2017 Filing 10 MOTION to Intervene filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I. (fjg) ( Docket text modified on 11/8/2017 to correct a typographical error)(jak)
November 1, 2017 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion. Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2017 01:30 PM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Chief Judge Brian S. Miller. (lc)
November 1, 2017 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby, 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC. Thomas Powell, Jr served on 10/26/2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Paul)
November 1, 2017 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons , filed by Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby, 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC. Jean Hervey served on 10/31/2017. (James, Paul)
November 1, 2017 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint, filed by Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby, 107 Liquor Inc, AB Liquor LLC. Steven Smith served on 10/27/2017. (James, Paul)
October 31, 2017 Filing 5 (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Based on #4 Order, the Clerk's office has reassigned the case to Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 10/31/2017. (scw)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER directing the Clerk to reassign the above style case. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 10/31/2017. (cmn)
October 30, 2017 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Monty Vaughan Baugh on behalf of All Defendants (Baugh, Monty)
October 30, 2017 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE AND DECLARATORY RELIEF filed by Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC, Deborah W Goolsby, 107 Liquor Inc, and AB Liquor LLC against All Defendants. (cmn)
October 30, 2017 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Pulaski County Circuit Court, case number 60CV-17-05989. Fee $400 receipt number LIT064296. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(cmn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 107 Liquor Inc et al v. Casteel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Robin Casteel
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jean Hervey
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Smith
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Powell, Jr
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Greenberg
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Anderson
Represented By: Monty Vaughan Baugh
Represented By: Jennifer L. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 107 Liquor Inc
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Deborah Truby Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AB Liquor LLC
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Deborah Truby Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah W Goolsby
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Deborah Truby Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bulloch Smith Holdings LLC
Represented By: Paul J. James
Represented By: Deborah Truby Riordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?