Alvarez v. USA et al

Plaintiff: Manuel DeJesus Perez Alvarez
Defendant: USA, G Beasley, Dallas B Jones, Correct Care Solutions and Does
Case Number: 4:2017cv00731
Filed: November 7, 2017
Court: Arkansas Eastern District Court
Office: Little Rock Office
County: Out of State
Referring Judge: Beth Deere
Presiding Judge: Brian S. Miller
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2018 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety 37 the partial recommended disposition; granting 22 defendants Beasley's and Jones's motion for summary judgment, and dismissing them, without prejudice; and denying 31 Defendant Correct Care Solution's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 8/3/2018. (kdr)
April 12, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting in its entirety 26 the partial recommended disposition; granting in part and denying in part 7 defendant Correct Care Solution's motion for summary judgment; dismissing with prejudice Alvarez's Bivens and FTCA claims ag ainst CCS; dismissing with prejudice Alvarezs state law claims against CCS for medical care he received at Forrest City Medium FCI; and allowing him to proceed on his state law claims for medical care he received at Beaumont Medium FCI. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 4/12/2018. (kdr)
March 21, 2018 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting 16 Partial Report and Recommendations in its entirety. Alvarez's claims against the Doe defendants are dismissed without prejudice. It is certified that an in forma pauperis appeal of this order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by Chief Judge Brian S. Miller on 3/21/2018. (mcz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arkansas Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarez v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel DeJesus Perez Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dallas B Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correct Care Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?